There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

MORE Act of 2019
Marijuana Opportunity Reinvestment and Expungement Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To decriminalize and deschedule cannabis, to provide for reinvestment in certain persons adversely impacted by the War on Drugs, to provide for expungement of certain cannabis offenses, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/23/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date
11/21/2019Ordered to be Reported (Amended).
11/21/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
11/19/2019Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Discharged.
08/12/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
08/07/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/23/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, Small Business, Natural Resources, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/23/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, Small Business, Natural Resources, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/23/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, Small Business, Natural Resources, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/23/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, Small Business, Natural Resources, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/23/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, Small Business, Natural Resources, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/23/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, Small Business, Natural Resources, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/23/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, Small Business, Natural Resources, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/23/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, Small Business, Natural Resources, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/23/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (65)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 07/23/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/23/2019
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 07/23/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 07/23/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1]* 07/23/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 07/23/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/23/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 07/23/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4]* 07/23/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 07/23/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16]* 07/23/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/23/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 07/23/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 07/23/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 07/23/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 07/23/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 07/23/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 07/23/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3]* 07/23/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 07/23/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 07/23/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 07/23/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 07/23/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 07/23/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/23/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 07/23/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 07/23/2019
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 07/23/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 07/23/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 07/24/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 07/30/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/30/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/02/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 08/16/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 08/16/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 09/06/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 09/06/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 09/11/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/11/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/17/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/17/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 09/19/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 09/24/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 10/04/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 10/04/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 10/04/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/08/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/11/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 10/17/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 10/28/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 10/30/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/30/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 11/08/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 11/14/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 11/15/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 11/19/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 11/19/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 11/21/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 11/22/2019
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 11/22/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/22/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 11/22/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 11/22/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 11/22/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/05/2019

Committees (8)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/23/2019 Referred to
11/21/2019 Markup by
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security08/12/2019 Referred to
11/19/2019 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce07/23/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture07/23/2019 Referred to
House Education and Labor07/23/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means07/23/2019 Referred to
House Small Business07/23/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources07/23/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands08/07/2019 Referred to
House Oversight and Reform07/23/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.