There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

ONDCP Technical Corrections Act of 2019

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

ONDCP Technical Corrections Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

ONDCP Technical Corrections Act of 2019

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

ONDCP Technical Corrections Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Office of National Drug Control Policy Reauthorization Act of 1998 to make technical corrections.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
11/27/2019Became Public Law No: 116-74. (TXT | PDF)
11/27/2019Signed by President.
11/21/2019Presented to President.
11/14/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
11/14/2019Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6614)
10/16/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8165-8166)
07/23/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
11/27/2019Became Public Law No: 116-74. (TXT | PDF)
11/27/2019Signed by President.
11/21/2019HousePresented to President.
11/18/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/14/2019SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
11/14/2019SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6614)
10/17/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
10/16/2019-2:57pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/16/2019-2:57pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8165-8166)
10/16/2019-2:52pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3889.
10/16/2019-2:52pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8165-8167)
10/16/2019-2:52pmHouseMr. Rouda moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/25/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Reform
07/23/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/23/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/23/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 07/23/2019

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Reform07/23/2019 Referred to
07/25/2019 Markup by
House Energy and Commerce07/23/2019 Referred to
Senate Judiciary10/17/2019 Referred to
11/14/2019 Discharged from

As of 01/25/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.3889 - ONDCP Technical Corrections Act of 2019


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3889. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/23/2019)

ONDCP Technical Corrections Act of 2019

This bill amends the Office of National Drug Control Policy Reauthorization Act of 1998 and the Substance Abuse Prevention Act of 2018, including to repeal an auditing requirement and make technical corrections.