There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Equal Treatment of Public Servants Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title II of the Social Security Act to replace the windfall elimination provision with a formula equalizing benefits for certain individuals with noncovered employment, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/24/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
07/24/2019Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/24/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19]* 07/24/2019
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 07/24/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2]* 07/24/2019
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 07/24/2019
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 07/24/2019
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 07/24/2019
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 07/24/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 07/24/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15]* 07/24/2019
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 07/24/2019
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6]* 07/24/2019
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 07/24/2019
Rep. Hern, Kevin [R-OK-1]* 07/24/2019
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23]* 07/24/2019
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 07/24/2019
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 07/24/2019
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 07/24/2019
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 07/24/2019
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 07/24/2019
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4]* 07/24/2019
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 07/24/2019
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3]* 07/24/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 07/24/2019
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 07/24/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6]* 07/24/2019
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7]* 07/24/2019
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2]* 07/24/2019
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 07/25/2019
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 09/06/2019
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5] 09/06/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 09/06/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16] 09/17/2019
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 09/24/2019
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 10/23/2019
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 10/28/2019
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 10/31/2019
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18] 11/01/2019
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3] 11/01/2019
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 11/12/2019
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 11/13/2019
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 11/13/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means07/24/2019 Referred to

As of 11/15/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.3934 - Equal Treatment of Public Servants Act of 2019


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.