There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

FedRAMP Authorization Act
Federal Risk and Authorization Management Program Authorization Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Reported to House

FedRAMP Authorization Act
Federal Risk and Authorization Management Program Authorization Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Introduced

FedRAMP Authorization Act
Federal Risk and Authorization Management Program Authorization Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To enhance the innovation, security, and availability of cloud computing services used in the Federal Government by establishing the Federal Risk and Authorization Management Program within the General Services Administration and by establishing a risk management, authorization, and continuous monitoring process to enable the Federal Government to leverage cloud computing services using a risk-based approach consistent with the Federal Information Security Modernization Act of 2014 and cloud-based operations, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
02/05/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
02/05/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Reform. H. Rept. 116-391.
07/24/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber All Actions
02/10/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
02/05/2020-3:56pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/05/2020-3:56pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H815-817)
02/05/2020-3:46pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3941.
02/05/2020-3:46pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H815-819)
02/05/2020-3:46pmHouseMrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
02/05/2020HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 315.
02/05/2020HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Reform. H. Rept. 116-391.
12/19/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Reform
07/24/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
07/24/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 07/24/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 07/30/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Oversight and Reform07/24/2019 Referred to
12/19/2019 Markup by
02/05/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-391
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs02/10/2020 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3941.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3941. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (02/05/2020)

Federal Risk and Authorization Management Program Authorization Act of 2019 or the FedRAMP Authorization Act

This bill provides statutory authority for the Federal Risk and Authorization Management Program (FedRAMP) within the General Services Administration (GSA).

The GSA must establish a government-wide program that provides the authoritative standardized approach to security assessment and authorization for cloud computing products and services that process unclassified information used by agencies. Agencies must ensure that their cloud computing services meet GSA requirements.

The bill establishes the Joint Authorization Board to conduct security assessments of cloud computing services and issue provisional authorizations to operate to cloud service providers that meet FedRAMP security guidelines.

The GSA shall (1) determine the requirements for certification of independent assessment organizations, and (2) establish the Federal Secure Cloud Advisory Committee.