There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 12711 East Jefferson Avenue in Detroit, Michigan, as the "Aretha Franklin Post Office Building".


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
02/05/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
07/25/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber All Actions
02/10/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
02/05/2020-4:23pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/05/2020-4:23pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H827)
02/05/2020-4:11pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3976.
02/05/2020-4:11pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H827-828)
02/05/2020-4:10pmHouseMrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/19/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Reform
07/25/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
07/25/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (15)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Reform07/25/2019 Referred to
12/19/2019 Markup by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs02/10/2020 Referred to

As of 08/09/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.3976 - To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 12711 East Jefferson Avenue in Detroit, Michigan, as the "Aretha Franklin Post Office Building".


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3976. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/25/2019)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 12711 East Jefferson Avenue in Detroit, Michigan, as the "Aretha Franklin Post Office Building."