There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Social Determinants Accelerator Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Health and Human Services to establish an interagency council on social determinants of health, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/25/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
07/26/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/25/2019Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/25/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 07/25/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 07/25/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/30/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 09/10/2019
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 10/04/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 10/11/2019
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 10/21/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/13/2019
Rep. McAdams, Ben [D-UT-4] 11/13/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 01/24/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 01/24/2020
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14] 02/27/2020
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/15/2020
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/15/2020
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/15/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/18/2020
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 06/18/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 06/18/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/18/2020
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 06/18/2020
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/18/2020
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 06/24/2020
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/24/2020
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/24/2020
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 06/24/2020
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 06/26/2020
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 06/26/2020
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 06/30/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/30/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce07/25/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health07/26/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4004. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/25/2019)

Social Determinants Accelerator Act of 2019

This bill establishes the Social Determinants Accelerator Interagency Council and provides funds for the council to (1) assist the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) in awarding specified grants, (2) increase coordination among health and social service programs, and (3) provide program evaluation guidance and technical assistance to increase the impact of social service programs. Specifically, the bill provides funds for the CMS to award up to 25 grants to state, local, or tribal health or human services agencies for the development of social determinants accelerator plans that address at least one health and one social outcome for a specified target population.