There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide that the amount of time that an elderly offender must serve before being eligible for placement in home detention is to be reduced by the amount of good time credits earned by the prisoner, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/03/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9191)
11/26/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-311.
07/25/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/19/2019SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 392.
12/18/2019SenateRead the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
12/04/2019SenateReceived in the Senate.
12/03/2019-4:08pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/03/2019-4:08pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9191)
12/03/2019-4:02pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4018.
12/03/2019-4:02pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9191-9192)
12/03/2019-4:02pmHouseMr. Deutch moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/26/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 252.
11/26/2019HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-311.
09/10/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 8.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/10/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/10/2019HouseSubcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Discharged.
08/28/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/25/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
07/25/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (12)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/25/2019 Referred to
09/10/2019 Markup by
11/26/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-311
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security08/28/2019 Referred to
09/10/2019 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4018. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (12/03/2019)

This bill modifies the eligibility criteria for an elderly offender to qualify for early release from prison and placement in home detention.

Specifically, it reduces the amount of a prison term an elderly offender must serve by the amount of good time credits earned by the offender.