Text: H.R.4018 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Placed on Calendar Senate (12/19/2019)

Calendar No. 392

116th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 4018


To provide that the amount of time that an elderly offender must serve before being eligible for placement in home detention is to be reduced by the amount of good time credits earned by the prisoner, and for other purposes.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

December 4, 2019

Received

December 18, 2019

Read the first time

December 19, 2019

Read the second time and placed on the calendar


AN ACT

To provide that the amount of time that an elderly offender must serve before being eligible for placement in home detention is to be reduced by the amount of good time credits earned by the prisoner, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Good conduct time credits for certain elderly nonviolent offenders.

Section 231(g)(5)(A)(ii) of the Second Chance Act of 2007 (34 U.S.C. 60541(g)(5)(A)(ii)) is amended by striking “to which the offender was sentenced” and inserting “reduced by any credit toward the service of the prisoner’s sentence awarded under section 3624(b) of title 18, United States Code”.

SEC. 2. Determination of budgetary effects.

The budgetary effects of this Act, for the purpose of complying with the Statutory Pay-As-You-Go Act of 2010, shall be determined by reference to the latest statement titled “Budgetary Effects of PAYGO Legislation” for this Act, submitted for printing in the Congressional Record by the Chairman of the House Budget Committee, provided that such statement has been submitted prior to the vote on passage.

Passed the House of Representatives December 3, 2019.

Attest:
Cheryl L. Johnson,

Clerk  


Calendar No. 392

116th CONGRESS
     1st Session
H. R. 4018

AN ACT
To provide that the amount of time that an elderly offender must serve before being eligible for placement in home detention is to be reduced by the amount of good time credits earned by the prisoner, and for other purposes.

December 19, 2019
Read the second time and placed on the calendar
Share This