There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

GLRI Act of 2019
Great Lakes Restoration Initiative Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to House

GLRI Act of 2019
Great Lakes Restoration Initiative Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

GLRI Act of 2019
Great Lakes Restoration Initiative Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Water Pollution Control Act to reauthorize the Great Lakes Restoration Initiative, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
02/05/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 373 - 45 (Roll no. 36).
11/13/2019Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-287.
07/25/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
02/10/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
02/05/2020-5:41pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/05/2020-5:41pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 373 - 45 (Roll no. 36). (text: CR H799)
02/05/2020-5:32pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H833-834)
02/05/2020-2:37pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
02/05/2020-1:57pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4031.
02/05/2020-1:57pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H799-805)
02/05/2020-1:57pmHouseMrs. Napolitano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
11/13/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 231.
11/13/2019HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-287.
09/19/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
09/19/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
09/19/2019HouseSubcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged.
07/26/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/25/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
07/25/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 07/25/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-16]* 07/25/2019
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/30/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 07/30/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 09/10/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/13/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 09/16/2019
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 09/19/2019
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 10/04/2019
Rep. Steil, Bryan [R-WI-1] 10/18/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 10/21/2019
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 10/30/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure07/25/2019 Referred to
09/19/2019 Markup by
11/13/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-287
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment07/26/2019 Referred to
09/19/2019 Discharged from
Senate Environment and Public Works02/10/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4031. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (02/05/2020)

Great Lakes Restoration Initiative Act of 2019 or the GLRI Act of 2019

This bill reauthorizes through FY2026 the Great Lakes Restoration Initiative.