There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Safe from the Start Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To improve United States consideration of, and strategic support for, programs to prevent and respond to gender-based violence from the onset of humanitarian emergencies and build the capacity of humanitarian assistance to address the immediate and long-term challenges resulting from such violence, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/30/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
10/08/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights, and International Organizations.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
07/30/2019Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1010)
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 09/17/2019
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 09/17/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/17/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 09/17/2019
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 10/28/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 11/08/2019
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 11/08/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 11/13/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 11/14/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 12/04/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 12/04/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 12/04/2019
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 12/06/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 12/10/2019
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 12/11/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 12/17/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 01/07/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/07/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 01/07/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 01/08/2020
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 01/10/2020
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3] 01/28/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 01/28/2020
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/05/2020
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 02/06/2020
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/14/2020
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/19/2020
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 05/19/2020
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 09/04/2020
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/04/2020
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 09/04/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/04/2020
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 09/04/2020
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 09/04/2020
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 09/04/2020
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 09/04/2020
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 09/04/2020
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 09/04/2020
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 09/04/2020
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 09/14/2020
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 09/18/2020
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 09/23/2020
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/23/2020
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 10/16/2020
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 12/16/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs07/30/2019 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights, and International Organizations10/08/2019 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4092.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4092. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/30/2019)

Safe from the Start Act of 2019

This bill directs the Department of State to direct U.S. foreign assistance to address humanitarian crises in a manner that aims to prevent and respond to gender-based violence at the onset of an emergency.

Specifically, the State Department shall focus on (1) preventing gender-based violence, (2) protecting survivors of humanitarian crises from the onset of the emergency, (3) promoting standards and activities to prevent and respond to gender-based violence, and (4) advancing and empowering survivors and at-risk individuals. Activities shall include improving access to post-sexual-assault medical and mental health services and ensuring such services are available to hard-to-reach populations. The State Department may provide support to local and international organizations to achieve its goals.