There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Afghan Women's Inclusion in Negotiations Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require a report on the participation of Afghan women in negotiations and dialogue relating to the Afghan peace process and a strategy for post-conflict engagement by the United States in Afghanistan, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/30/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
10/08/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific and Nonproliferation.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
07/30/2019Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 10/04/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/04/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 10/04/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 10/04/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 10/04/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 10/04/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 10/04/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 10/04/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 10/04/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 10/04/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 10/16/2019
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6] 10/16/2019
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 10/16/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 10/28/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 10/28/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 10/28/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 10/28/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 10/28/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/28/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/28/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 11/01/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 11/01/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/01/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 11/01/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 11/01/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 11/01/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/12/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 11/12/2019
Rep. Waltz, Michael [R-FL-6] 12/11/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 01/09/2020
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 01/28/2020
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 01/28/2020
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 01/29/2020
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 03/04/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs07/30/2019 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific and Nonproliferation10/08/2019 Referred to

As of 09/19/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.4097 - Afghan Women's Inclusion in Negotiations Act


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4097. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/30/2019)

Afghan Women's Inclusion in Negotiations Act

This bill requires the Department of State to report on the participation of Afghan women in the Afghan peace process and a strategy for U.S. post-conflict engagement in Afghanistan.

Specifically, the State Department must report on (1) the participation of Afghan women in negotiations and dialogue related to the Afghan peace process and the protection of their rights and gains; and (2) the actions of the State Department to consult with and train local women-led civil society organizations and to advocate for their inclusion and participation in peacebuilding, conflict prevention, and post-conflict reconciliation.

The State Department must also develop a strategy for U.S. post-conflict engagement in Afghanistan to support the implementation of commitments for women and girls' inclusion and empowerment, as well as to protect and promote basic human rights.