There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Build Local, Hire Local Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish an expansive infrastructure program to create local jobs and raise the quality of life in every community, to launch middle class career pathways in infrastructure, and to invest in high-quality American jobs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/30/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date
08/21/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
08/12/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
08/09/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
08/09/2019Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
08/01/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
08/01/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
08/01/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
08/01/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/30/2019Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Agriculture, Financial Services, Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, Homeland Security, and Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/2019Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Agriculture, Financial Services, Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, Homeland Security, and Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/2019Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Agriculture, Financial Services, Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, Homeland Security, and Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/2019Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Agriculture, Financial Services, Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, Homeland Security, and Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/2019Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Agriculture, Financial Services, Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, Homeland Security, and Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/2019Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Agriculture, Financial Services, Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, Homeland Security, and Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/2019Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Agriculture, Financial Services, Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, Homeland Security, and Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/2019Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Agriculture, Financial Services, Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, Homeland Security, and Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 07/30/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 08/06/2019
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large] 08/23/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/17/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/01/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 10/01/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/01/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/01/2019
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/01/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 10/01/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/01/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 10/01/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/04/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 10/08/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 10/18/2019

Committees (8)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure07/30/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management08/01/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways and Transit08/01/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment08/01/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Aviation08/01/2019 Referred to
House Education and Labor07/30/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture07/30/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit08/12/2019 Referred to
House Financial Services07/30/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce07/30/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources07/30/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States08/09/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands08/09/2019 Referred to
House Homeland Security07/30/2019 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security08/21/2019 Referred to
House Small Business07/30/2019 Referred to

As of 10/19/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.4101 - Build Local, Hire Local Act


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.