There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Funding Early Childhood is the Right IDEA Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize funding for section 619 and part C of the Individuals with Disabilities Education Act.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/30/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
07/30/2019Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 08/02/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 08/20/2019
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 08/20/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 08/20/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 08/30/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 09/10/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/12/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/12/2019
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8] 09/13/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 09/13/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 09/16/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/19/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 09/25/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 09/26/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 09/27/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/27/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 10/04/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/04/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 11/13/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 11/14/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/15/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 11/19/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 11/20/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 12/03/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 12/11/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 12/16/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 12/16/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 12/16/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 12/16/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 12/17/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/18/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 01/02/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 01/10/2020
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 01/27/2020
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 02/05/2020
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/21/2020
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 10/09/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Education and Labor07/30/2019 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4107.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4107. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/30/2019)

Funding Early Childhood is the Right IDEA Act

This bill reauthorizes funding for specified provisions of the Individuals with Disabilities Education Act for early childhood education.

Specifically, the bill reauthorizes through FY2024 section 619 (grants to states for preschool programs serving children with disabilities ages three to five) and part C (grants to aid states in implementing early intervention services for infants and toddlers with disabilities and their families).