There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Jumpstart on College Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Education to make grants to support early college high schools and dual or concurrent enrollment programs.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/30/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
07/30/2019Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 07/30/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4]* 07/30/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 08/02/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 08/02/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 08/13/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 08/13/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 08/16/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 08/16/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 08/16/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 08/23/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 08/23/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 09/06/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/10/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 09/20/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 09/24/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 10/04/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 10/04/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 10/08/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 10/08/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 10/17/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/22/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 10/22/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/05/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 11/13/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor07/30/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.