There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of the Interior to remove the statue to the memory and in honor of Albert Pike erected near Judiciary Square in the District of Columbia, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
12/14/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-640.
07/30/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date All Actions
12/14/2020Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 525.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/14/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-640.
09/30/2020Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/30/2020Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/30/2020Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
07/21/2020Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands
08/21/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/30/2019Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1018)
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 09/06/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/30/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/20/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources07/30/2019 Referred to
09/30/2020 Markup by
12/14/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-640
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands08/21/2019 Referred to
07/21/2020 Hearings by
09/30/2020 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.4135.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4135. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/30/2019)

This bill directs the Department of the Interior to remove the statue of Albert Pike near Judiciary Square in the District of Columbia using nonfederal funds.