There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

GI Bill Planning Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Introduced

GI Bill Planning Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to extend the period under which an election must be made for entitlement to educational assistance under the All-Volunteer Educational Assistance Program of Department of Veterans Affairs, to phase out the use of such program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
11/12/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 408 - 0 (Roll no. 610).(text: CR H8758)
08/06/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/13/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
11/12/2019-7:01pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/12/2019-7:01pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 408 - 0 (Roll no. 610). (text: CR H8758)
11/12/2019-6:29pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8774)
11/12/2019-5:23pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
11/12/2019-5:10pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4162.
11/12/2019-5:10pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8758-8760)
11/12/2019-5:10pmHouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/16/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
10/16/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
10/16/2019HouseSubcommittee on Economic Opportunity Discharged.
08/22/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
08/06/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
08/06/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (15)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs08/06/2019 Referred to
10/16/2019 Markup by
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity08/22/2019 Referred to
10/16/2019 Discharged from
Senate Veterans' Affairs11/13/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

With the start of a new Congress, summaries from prior Congresses may be delayed or abbreviated.