There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Promoting Renewable Energy with Shared Solar Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Utility Regulatory Policies Act of 1978 to promote safe and reliable interconnection and net billing for community solar facilities.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
08/06/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
08/07/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
08/06/2019Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/06/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 09/16/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 09/18/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 09/25/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce08/06/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy08/07/2019 Referred to

As of 10/25/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.4175 - Promoting Renewable Energy with Shared Solar Act of 2019


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.