There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Gun Safety Board and Research Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a Gun Safety Board, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
08/09/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
08/12/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
08/09/2019Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/09/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 11/05/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 12/13/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/16/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce08/09/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health08/12/2019 Referred to

As of 09/27/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.4177 - Gun Safety Board and Research Act of 2019


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4177. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (08/09/2019)

Gun Safety Board and Research Act of 2019

This bill establishes a gun safety board in the Department of Health and Human Services. The board must (1) conduct original research about firearm violence reduction; (2) publish policy recommendations for and findings about the efficacy of federal, state, and local actions to reduce firearm violence in the Federal Register; and (3) establish a grant program to support original research on firearm violence reduction and education for the public about the effects of and ways to mitigate firearm violence.