There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

HACT Act
Homeland and Cyber Threat Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 28, United States Code, to allow claims against foreign states for unlawful computer intrusion, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
08/16/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
08/16/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/16/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (67)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3]* 08/16/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/24/2019
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 10/18/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 10/18/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 10/18/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 10/18/2019
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8] 10/21/2019
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17] 10/21/2019
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 10/21/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 10/22/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 10/31/2019
Rep. Fletcher, Lizzie [D-TX-7] 11/13/2019
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 11/18/2019
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1] 11/20/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 11/20/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 11/26/2019
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11] 12/03/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 12/03/2019
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 12/10/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 12/10/2019
Rep. Miller, Carol D. [R-WV-3] 12/11/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 12/11/2019
Rep. Waltz, Michael [R-FL-6] 01/09/2020
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 01/09/2020
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 01/09/2020
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 01/09/2020
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 01/09/2020
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-2] 01/16/2020
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 01/16/2020
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 01/16/2020
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 01/29/2020
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 01/29/2020
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/29/2020
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 01/29/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 01/30/2020
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 01/30/2020
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 01/30/2020
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 02/05/2020
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 02/05/2020
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/07/2020
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 02/07/2020
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 02/13/2020
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 02/13/2020
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32] 02/13/2020
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 02/25/2020
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/04/2020
Rep. Stanton, Greg [D-AZ-9] 03/04/2020
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 03/05/2020
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 03/09/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 03/11/2020
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 04/14/2020
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 04/23/2020
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 05/13/2020
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/13/2020
Rep. Cloud, Michael [R-TX-27] 05/15/2020
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10] 05/15/2020
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 05/27/2020
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/27/2020
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3] 05/27/2020
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/27/2020
Rep. Spano, Ross [R-FL-15] 05/28/2020
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 06/15/2020
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 06/15/2020
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 06/18/2020
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 07/16/2020
Rep. Torres Small, Xochitl [D-NM-2] 07/16/2020
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 07/16/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary08/16/2019 Referred to

As of 08/10/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.4189 - Homeland and Cyber Threat Act


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4189. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (08/16/2019)

Homeland and Cyber Threat Act or the HACT Act

This bill allows claims in federal or state court against foreign states that conduct or participate in cyberattacks against U.S. nationals.