There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Student Loan Disclosure Transparency Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To improve Federal student loan disclosures, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
08/16/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
08/16/2019Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/16/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1]* 08/16/2019
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 08/16/2019
Rep. McAdams, Ben [D-UT-4]* 08/16/2019
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3]* 08/16/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7]* 08/16/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 08/27/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 08/27/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 09/06/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/12/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 09/12/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 09/12/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 09/12/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 09/17/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 09/17/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 09/17/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/19/2019
Rep. Stanton, Greg [D-AZ-9] 09/19/2019
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 09/19/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/25/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 09/25/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/25/2019
Rep. Waltz, Michael [R-FL-6] 09/25/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 09/25/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 09/25/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 10/04/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 10/04/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/04/2019
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 10/04/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 10/08/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 10/08/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 10/18/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 10/21/2019
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 10/30/2019
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 10/30/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 11/12/2019
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 11/13/2019
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 11/14/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/21/2019
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 11/21/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8] 12/05/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 12/05/2019
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 03/04/2020
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 06/22/2020
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8] 06/30/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Education and Labor08/16/2019 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4193.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4193. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (08/16/2019)

Student Loan Disclosure Transparency Act of 2019

This bill requires a lender disbursing a loan that is insured or guaranteed by the federal government to make certain disclosures.

Specifically, prior to disbursement, the lender making such loan must disclose the (1) principal amount, interest rate, and number of required monthly payments to be made on the loan; (2) estimated balance owed by the borrower; and (3) estimated aggregate amount the borrower will pay.

Prior to repayment, the lender must disclose the projected total of interest charges that the borrower will pay on the loan, as well as projections of the borrower's monthly repayment amount.

Lastly, the lender must disclose certain specified information monthly, including the (1) original principal amount of each of the borrower's loans, separately and in the aggregate; (2) current balance on each loan and on all loans in the aggregate; (3) interest rate on each loan and the total amount the borrower has paid in interest; and (4) a description of each fee the borrower has been charged for the preceding installment period.

The Department of Education must obtain feedback from individuals and report on the usefulness and effectiveness of such disclosures.