There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Animal Welfare Enforcement Improvement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Animal Welfare Act to increase protections for animals, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
08/27/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
09/04/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
08/27/2019Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/27/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 08/30/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 08/30/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 08/30/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/06/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/06/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 09/06/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/06/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/06/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/06/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/06/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/06/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 09/06/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 09/09/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 09/10/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 09/11/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/16/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 09/18/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/24/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/24/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/24/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 10/01/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 10/01/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/01/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 10/08/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 10/08/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 10/11/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 10/11/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/11/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 10/15/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 10/16/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 10/22/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 10/28/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 12/12/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 12/12/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 01/03/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 01/30/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture08/27/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture09/04/2019 Referred to

As of 02/18/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.4211 - Animal Welfare Enforcement Improvement Act


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4211. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (08/27/2019)

Animal Welfare Enforcement Improvement Act

This bill revises the licensing process of the Department of Agriculture (USDA) for animal dealers and exhibitors to expand USDA's oversight and enforcement of animal welfare requirements. The bill also authorizes citizen suits to enforce the Animal Welfare Act.

Dealers and exhibitors must apply to USDA for licenses or renewal licenses each year. Before issuing or renewing licenses, USDA must conduct unannounced facility inspections.

USDA must deny an application for

  • a new license if the applicant fails to meet animal welfare standards during a second inspection,
  • a renewal license if the applicant violates such standards in more than one inspection in the previous two years, or
  • a new or renewal license if the dealer or exhibitor has violated laws relating to animals or if the issuance of the license would facilitate the circumvention of state or local laws that prohibit the private ownership of certain animals.

Further, USDA must suspend the licenses of dealers or exhibitors whose violations present a risk to animal welfare. USDA must revoke the licenses if the violations persist or if the licensees commit multiple violations. Dealers and exhibitors with suspended or revoked licenses may not be (1) granted another license, (2) granted another license through another person or entity, or (3) employed by another licensee to work with animals during the period of the suspension or revocation.