There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

MAPS Act
Mapping Accuracy Promotes Services Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

MAPS Act
Mapping Accuracy Promotes Services Act

Short Titles as Introduced

MAPS Act
Mapping Accuracy Promotes Services Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit the submission to the Federal Communications Commission of broadband internet access service coverage information or data for the purposes of compiling an inaccurate broadband coverage map.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/16/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H10291)
12/16/2019Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-349.
09/06/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
12/17/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
12/16/2019-4:37pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/16/2019-4:37pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10291)
12/16/2019-4:32pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4227.
12/16/2019-4:32pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10291-10292)
12/16/2019-4:32pmHouseMr. Doyle, Michael F. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/16/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 278.
12/16/2019HouseReported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-349.
11/20/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
11/20/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
11/14/2019HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology
11/14/2019HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology
09/11/2019HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology
09/07/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/06/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
09/06/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (48)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 09/06/2019
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 09/06/2019
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 09/06/2019
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/17/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 11/18/2019
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 11/21/2019
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 12/04/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 12/04/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 12/04/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 12/04/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 12/04/2019
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 12/04/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/05/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6] 12/05/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 12/05/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 12/05/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 12/05/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 12/05/2019
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12] 12/05/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 12/06/2019
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 12/06/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 12/06/2019
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 12/06/2019
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10] 12/06/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 12/06/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 12/06/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8] 12/06/2019
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 12/06/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 12/06/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 12/06/2019
Rep. Torres Small, Xochitl [D-NM-2] 12/06/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 12/06/2019
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1] 12/06/2019
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 12/06/2019
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 12/06/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 12/06/2019
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 12/06/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 12/06/2019
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 12/06/2019
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 12/06/2019
Rep. Keller, Fred [R-PA-12] 12/06/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 12/06/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 12/06/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 12/09/2019
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 12/09/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 12/09/2019
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 12/09/2019
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 12/16/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce09/06/2019 Referred to
11/20/2019 Markup by
12/16/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-349
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology09/07/2019 Referred to
09/11/2019 Hearings by
11/14/2019 Markup by
11/14/2019 Reported by
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation12/17/2019 Referred to

As of 01/21/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.4227 - Mapping Accuracy Promotes Services Act


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4227. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (12/16/2019)

Mapping Accuracy Promotes Services Act or the MAPS Act

This bill makes it unlawful to willfully, knowingly, or recklessly submit inaccurate broadband coverage information or data (mapping data) to the Federal Communications Commission.