There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

RARE Act of 2019
Rare disease Advancement, surveillance Research, and Education Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To expand and improve the programs and activities of the Department of Health and Human Services for awareness, education, research, surveillance, diagnosis, and treatment concerning rare diseases and conditions.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/06/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
09/09/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/09/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1107)
Action By: House of Representatives
09/06/2019Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/06/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (60)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 09/06/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 09/06/2019
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 09/06/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 09/06/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 09/06/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 09/06/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/06/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 09/06/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 09/06/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 09/06/2019
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7]* 09/06/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/06/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 09/06/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48]* 09/06/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 09/06/2019
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 09/06/2019
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/17/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 09/18/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/18/2019
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 09/26/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 10/21/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 10/21/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 10/21/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 10/22/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 10/23/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 10/23/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 10/29/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/29/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 10/30/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 10/30/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 11/08/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 11/08/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 11/08/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/08/2019
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 11/14/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 11/14/2019
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 11/15/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 11/19/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/19/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 12/05/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 12/05/2019
Rep. McBath, Lucy [D-GA-6] 12/09/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 12/11/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 12/11/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 12/11/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 12/11/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/08/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/08/2020
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1] 01/09/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 01/09/2020
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 01/16/2020
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 01/16/2020
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 01/16/2020
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 01/17/2020
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 01/29/2020
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 02/04/2020
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 02/25/2020
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/14/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 06/22/2020
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11] 07/29/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce09/06/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health09/09/2019 Referred to

As of 08/07/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.4228 - Rare disease Advancement, surveillance Research, and Education Act of 2019


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4228. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/06/2019)

Rare disease Advancement, surveillance Research, and Education Act of 2019 or the RARE Act of 2019

The bill reauthorizes through FY2024 the National Institutes of Health Rare Disease Regional Centers of Excellence and expands activities to facilitate research and increase awareness of rare diseases and conditions. (Rare diseases and conditions are those with a prevalence of fewer than 200,000 individuals in the United States.)

The Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC) may expand infrastructure and activities to track the epidemiology of up to four rare diseases and conditions and incorporate this information into a National Rare Disease or Condition Surveillance System.

The Agency for Healthcare Research and Quality must expand its activities to increase health care providers' awareness of rare diseases and conditions.

The National Academies of Sciences, Engineering, and Medicine, or another appropriate entity, must update the 2010 report Rare Diseases and Orphan Products: Accelerating Research and Development.