There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Broadband DATA Act
Broadband Deployment Accuracy and Technological Availability Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Broadband DATA Act
Broadband Deployment Accuracy and Technological Availability Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Broadband DATA Act
Broadband Deployment Accuracy and Technological Availability Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Federal Communications Commission to issue rules relating to the collection of data with respect to the availability of broadband services, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/16/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H10287-10289)
12/16/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-350.
09/06/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/17/2019SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 345.
12/16/2019-4:32pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/16/2019-4:32pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10287-10289)
12/16/2019-4:20pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4229.
12/16/2019-4:19pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10287-10291)
12/16/2019-4:19pmHouseMr. Doyle, Michael F. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
12/16/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 279.
12/16/2019HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-350.
11/20/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
11/20/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
11/14/2019HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology
11/14/2019HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology
09/11/2019HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology
09/07/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/06/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
09/06/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (67)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 09/06/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 09/06/2019
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 09/06/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/14/2019
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 11/14/2019
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 11/21/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 11/21/2019
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 11/21/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 11/21/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 11/21/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/21/2019
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 11/21/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 11/22/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 11/22/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 11/22/2019
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 11/22/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/22/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 11/22/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 12/03/2019
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 12/03/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 12/03/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/03/2019
Rep. Golden, Jared F. [D-ME-2] 12/03/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 12/04/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 12/04/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 12/04/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 12/04/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 12/04/2019
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 12/04/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 12/04/2019
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14] 12/04/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 12/04/2019
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 12/05/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 12/05/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6] 12/05/2019
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12] 12/05/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/05/2019
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 12/06/2019
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 12/06/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 12/06/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 12/06/2019
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 12/06/2019
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1] 12/06/2019
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10] 12/06/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 12/06/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8] 12/06/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 12/06/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 12/06/2019
Rep. Keller, Fred [R-PA-12] 12/06/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 12/06/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/06/2019
Rep. Torres Small, Xochitl [D-NM-2] 12/06/2019
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 12/06/2019
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 12/06/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 12/06/2019
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 12/06/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 12/06/2019
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 12/06/2019
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 12/06/2019
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 12/06/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 12/06/2019
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 12/06/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 12/06/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 12/09/2019
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 12/09/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 12/09/2019
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 12/10/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce09/06/2019 Referred to
11/20/2019 Markup by
12/16/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-350
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology09/07/2019 Referred to
09/11/2019 Hearings by
11/14/2019 Markup by
11/14/2019 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4229. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (12/16/2019)

Broadband Deployment Accuracy and Technological Availability Act or the Broadband DATA Act

This bill requires the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) to change the way broadband data is collected, verified, and reported.

Specifically, the FCC must collect and disseminate granular broadband service availability data (broadband maps) from wired, fixed-wireless, satellite, and mobile broadband providers. To do this, the FCC is required to establish the Broadband Serviceable Location Fabric (a dataset of geocoded information for all broadband service locations, atop which broadband maps are overlaid) as the vehicle for reporting broadband service availability data.

Additionally, the FCC must put forth specified requirements for service availability data collected from broadband providers, and it must create a challenge process to enable the submission of independent data challenging the accuracy of FCC broadband maps.

The Government Accountability Office must report on identified locations where fixed broadband can be installed to improve the quality and completeness of data sources for the fabric.