There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Reported to House

Clean Industrial Technology Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Introduced

CIT Act of 2019
Clean Industrial Technology Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Energy Independence and Security Act of 2007 to establish a program to incentivize innovation and to enhance the industrial competitiveness of the United States by developing technologies to reduce emissions of nonpower industrial sectors, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
08/14/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 116-477.
09/06/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date All Actions
08/14/2020Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 383.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/14/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 116-477.
02/12/2020Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
02/12/2020Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
09/11/2019Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Energy
09/11/2019Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Energy
09/10/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
09/06/2019Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/06/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 09/06/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 09/06/2019
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large]* 09/06/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 09/06/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 09/06/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 09/10/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/10/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 09/10/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 09/12/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 09/12/2019
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 09/17/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 09/24/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 10/04/2019
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 10/04/2019
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11] 10/08/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 10/17/2019
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 10/22/2019
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/23/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 10/23/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 10/28/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 10/29/2019
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 10/29/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 10/30/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 10/30/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 10/30/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/31/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 11/08/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 11/08/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 11/08/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/08/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 11/12/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 11/12/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 11/13/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 11/13/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 11/13/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 11/21/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 12/03/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/03/2019
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6] 12/06/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 12/11/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 12/11/2019
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10] 01/08/2020
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/11/2020
Rep. McAdams, Ben [D-UT-4] 02/12/2020
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19] 02/25/2020
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 03/31/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Science, Space, and Technology09/06/2019 Referred to
02/12/2020 Markup by
08/14/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-477
House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Energy09/10/2019 Referred to
09/11/2019 Markup by
09/11/2019 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4230. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House (08/14/2020)

Clean Industrial Technology Act of 2019 or the CIT Act of 2019

This bill provides incentives for the nonpower industrial sector to reduce nonwater greenhouse gas emissions to the atmosphere.

Specifically, the bill requires the Department of Energy (DOE) to establish a research, development, and demonstration program to further the development and commercial application of innovative industrial emissions reduction technologies. Under the program, DOE must award grants and fund demonstration projects to develop and evaluate technologies designed to increase (1) the industrial competitiveness of the United States, and (2) the emission reductions of nonpower industrial sectors. DOE may also enter into contracts and cooperative agreements for these purposes.

In addition, DOE must establish an Industrial Technology Innovation Advisory Committee to provide advice to DOE and the Office of Science and Technology Policy about the program.

Finally, DOE must establish a technical assistance program to promote the commercial application of such emission reduction technologies.