There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Reauthorizing Security for Supreme Court Justices Act of 2019

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Reauthorizing Security for Supreme Court Justices Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to House

Reauthorizing Security for Supreme Court Justices Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Reauthorizing Security for Supreme Court Justices Act of 2019

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Reauthorizing Security for Supreme Court Justices Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Marshal of the Supreme Court and the Supreme Court Police to protect the Justices, employees, and official guests of the Supreme Court outside of the Supreme Court grounds, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
11/27/2019Became Public Law No: 116-75. (TXT | PDF)
11/27/2019Signed by President.
11/21/2019Presented to President.
11/19/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6679)
11/13/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8796-8797)
11/08/2019Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-278.
09/09/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
11/27/2019Became Public Law No: 116-75. (TXT | PDF)
11/27/2019Signed by President.
11/21/2019HousePresented to President.
11/20/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/19/2019SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6679)
11/14/2019SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
11/13/2019-12:40pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/13/2019-12:40pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8796-8797)
11/13/2019-12:38pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4258.
11/13/2019-12:38pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8796-8797)
11/13/2019-12:38pmHouseMr. Stanton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
11/08/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 223.
11/08/2019HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-278.
10/16/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
10/16/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
10/15/2019HouseSubcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet Discharged.
09/25/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/09/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
09/09/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17]* 09/09/2019
Rep. McBath, Lucy [D-GA-6] 10/15/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary09/09/2019 Referred to
10/16/2019 Markup by
11/08/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-278
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet09/25/2019 Referred to
10/15/2019 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.4258. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-75 (11/27/2019)

Reauthorizing Security for Supreme Court Justices Act of 2019

This bill permanently authorizes the Marshal of the Supreme Court and the Supreme Court Police to provide security protection for Supreme Court Justices (and their official guests) and officers and employees of the Supreme Court.

Additionally, it permits such protection to be provided in any location—not just in any state.