There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

PROTECT Hong Kong Act
Placing Restrictions on Teargas Exports and Crowd Control Technology to Hong Kong Act

Short Titles as Introduced

PROTECT Hong Kong Act
Placing Restrictions on Teargas Exports and Crowd Control Technology to Hong Kong Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To prohibit commercial exports of certain nonlethal crowd control items and defense articles and services to the Hong Kong Police, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit commercial exports of certain nonlethal crowd control items and defense articles and services to the Hong Kong Disciplined Services, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
10/15/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8124-8125)
09/10/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
10/16/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
10/15/2019-4:30pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
10/15/2019-4:30pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/15/2019-4:30pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8124-8125)
10/15/2019-4:08pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4270.
10/15/2019-4:08pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8124-8127)
10/15/2019-4:07pmHouseMr. Sherman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/25/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Unanimous Consent.
09/25/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/10/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
09/10/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs09/10/2019 Referred to
09/25/2019 Markup by
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs10/16/2019 Referred to

As of 10/20/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.4270 - Placing Restrictions on Teargas Exports and Crowd Control Technology to Hong Kong Act


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4270. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/10/2019)

Placing Restrictions on Teargas Exports and Crowd Control Technology to Hong Kong Act or the PROTECT Hong Kong Act

This bill directs the President to prohibit the issuance of licenses to export certain defense items and services to various forces in Hong Kong, including the Hong Kong Police Force, the Hong Kong Correctional Services Department, and the Hong Kong Government Flying Service.

Items subject to the prohibition include defense articles and services on the U.S. Munitions List and certain crime control and detection technology and software.

The prohibition shall not take effect if the President takes certain actions, such as certifying to Congress that the prohibited exports to a covered force other than the Hong Kong Police Force are required to achieve U.S. foreign policy goals.

The Department of State shall report to Congress as to items subject to the prohibition that have been exported to the Hong Kong forces covered in the bill in the last five years.