There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

TPS for Victims of Hurricane Dorian Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate The Bahamas under section 244 of the Immigration and Nationality Act to permit nationals of The Bahamas to be eligible for temporary protected status, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/10/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
09/25/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/10/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/10/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (56)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 09/11/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/11/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 09/11/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 09/11/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/11/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/11/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 09/11/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/11/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/11/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/11/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/11/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 09/11/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/11/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 09/11/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 09/11/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/11/2019
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 09/11/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/11/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 09/11/2019
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/11/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 09/11/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 09/11/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 09/12/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 09/12/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 09/12/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/12/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 09/12/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/13/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/13/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 09/13/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/13/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 09/16/2019
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 09/16/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 09/16/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 09/16/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 09/16/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/16/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 09/16/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 09/17/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 09/17/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 09/17/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 09/17/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/17/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/17/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 09/17/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 09/17/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 09/18/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 09/19/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 09/20/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/24/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 09/24/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 09/25/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 09/26/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 10/04/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary09/10/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship09/25/2019 Referred to

As of 11/11/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.4272 - TPS for Victims of Hurricane Dorian Act of 2019


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.