There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

TPS for Victims of Hurricane Dorian Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate The Bahamas under section 244 of the Immigration and Nationality Act to permit nationals of The Bahamas to be eligible for temporary protected status, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/10/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
09/25/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/10/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/10/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (56)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 09/11/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/11/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 09/11/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 09/11/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/11/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/11/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 09/11/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/11/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/11/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/11/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/11/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 09/11/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/11/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 09/11/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 09/11/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/11/2019
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 09/11/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/11/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 09/11/2019
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/11/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 09/11/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 09/11/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 09/12/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 09/12/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 09/12/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/12/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 09/12/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/13/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/13/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 09/13/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/13/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 09/16/2019
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 09/16/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 09/16/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 09/16/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 09/16/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/16/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 09/16/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 09/17/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 09/17/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 09/17/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 09/17/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/17/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/17/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 09/17/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 09/17/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 09/18/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 09/19/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 09/20/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/24/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 09/24/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 09/25/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 09/26/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 10/04/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary09/10/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship09/25/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4272. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/10/2019)

TPS for Victims of Hurricane Dorian Act of 2019

This bill designates the Bahamas as a temporary protected status (TPS) country for 18 months from the enactment of this bill. (Qualified nationals of a TPS-designated country shall have work authorization and may not be removed from the United States while the designation is in effect.)

A Bahamian national shall qualify for temporary protected status if the individual (1) has been continuously physically present in the United States since the bill's enactment, (2) meets certain admissibility and eligibility requirements generally required for such status, and (3) registers with the Department of Homeland Security.