There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Department of Veterans Affairs Expiring Authorities Act of 2019

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Department of Veterans Affairs Expiring Authorities Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Department of Veterans Affairs Expiring Authorities Act of 2019

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Department of Veterans Affairs Expiring Authorities Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to extend and modify certain authorities and requirements relating to the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
09/30/2019Became Public Law No: 116-61. (TXT | PDF)
09/30/2019Signed by President.
09/30/2019Presented to President.
09/23/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5632)
09/18/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 417 - 1 (Roll no. 535).(text: CR 9/17/2019 H7729-7730)
09/11/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
09/30/2019Became Public Law No: 116-61. (TXT | PDF)
09/30/2019Signed by President.
09/30/2019HousePresented to President.
09/24/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/23/2019SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5632)
09/19/2019SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
09/18/2019-2:02pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/18/2019-2:02pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 417 - 1 (Roll no. 535). (text: CR 9/17/2019 H7729-7730)
09/18/2019-1:52pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7767-7768)
09/17/2019-4:59pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/17/2019-4:37pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4285.
09/17/2019-4:37pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7729-7732)
09/17/2019-4:37pmHouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/11/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
09/11/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12]* 09/11/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 09/17/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs09/11/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.