There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Nationwide Injunction Abuse Prevention Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 28, United States Code, to limit the authority of district courts to provide injunctive relief, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/11/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
09/11/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/11/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 09/17/2019
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 09/24/2019
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/26/2019
Rep. Rose, John W. [R-TN-6] 10/16/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary09/11/2019 Referred to

As of 02/18/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.4292 - Nationwide Injunction Abuse Prevention Act of 2019


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4292. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/11/2019)

Nationwide Injunction Abuse Prevention Act of 2019

This bill limits the authority of federal district courts to issue injunctions.

Specifically, it prohibits a district court from issuing an injunction unless the injunction applies only to one of the following:

  • the parties to the case before that district court, or
  • the federal district in which the injunction is issued.