There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Fostering Stable Housing Opportunities Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Fostering Stable Housing Opportunities Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide Federal housing assistance on behalf of youths who are aging out of foster care, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
11/18/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8937-8938)
09/12/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
11/19/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
11/18/2019-6:30pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/18/2019-6:30pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8937-8938)
11/18/2019-6:20pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4300.
11/18/2019-6:20pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8937-8939)
11/18/2019-6:19pmHouseMr. Green, Al (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/20/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 47 - 0.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
09/20/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
09/19/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
09/18/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
09/12/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
09/12/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services09/12/2019 Referred to
09/20/2019 Markup by
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs11/19/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.