There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

School Shooting Safety and Preparedness Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of Education, in consultation with the Attorney General and the Secretary of Health and Human Services, to publish an annual report on indicators of school crime and safety that includes data on school shootings, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/12/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
09/18/2019Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 27 - 22.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
09/18/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
09/12/2019Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/12/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (53)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McBath, Lucy [D-GA-6]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 09/17/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 09/17/2019
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 09/17/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 09/17/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 09/17/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 09/17/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 09/17/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 09/17/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 09/17/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/17/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/18/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 09/18/2019
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 09/18/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 09/18/2019
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14] 09/18/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 09/18/2019
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/18/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 09/18/2019
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3] 09/18/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 09/18/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 09/18/2019
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/18/2019
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/18/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 09/18/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/19/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/19/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/24/2019
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 09/25/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 10/01/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 10/01/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 10/01/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 10/01/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 10/01/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/01/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 10/04/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 10/04/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/19/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 01/09/2020
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/09/2020
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 01/09/2020
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 01/09/2020
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 01/09/2020
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 01/13/2020
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 01/13/2020
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 01/13/2020
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 01/14/2020
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/04/2020
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/13/2020
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/01/2020
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/20/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 10/16/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor09/12/2019 Referred to
09/18/2019 Markup by

As of 11/25/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.4301 - School Shooting Safety and Preparedness Act


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4301. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/12/2019)

School Shooting Safety and Preparedness Act

This bill requires the Department of Education to publish an annual report on indicators of school crime and safety. Such report shall collect specified information, including (1) the number of school shootings that have taken place nationwide; (2) the age, gender, race, ethnicity, and nationality of each victim; (3) the motivation of the shooter; (4) how the shooting was stopped; and (5) the number and type of firearms and ammunition used in each shooting.