There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Bahamas TPS Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the Commonwealth of The Bahamas under section 244 of the Immigration and Nationality Act to permit nationals of the Commonwealth of The Bahamas to be eligible for temporary protected status under such section, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/12/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
10/02/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/12/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/12/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/12/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (107)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 09/12/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 09/12/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 09/12/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/01/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/01/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 10/01/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/01/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 10/01/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 10/01/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/01/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/01/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 10/01/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/01/2019
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/01/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 10/01/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 10/01/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/01/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 10/01/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 10/01/2019
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 10/01/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 10/01/2019
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 10/01/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/01/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 10/01/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 10/01/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 10/01/2019
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 10/01/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 10/01/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 10/01/2019
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 10/01/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/01/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 10/01/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 10/01/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/01/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 10/01/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 10/01/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 10/01/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 10/01/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/01/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 10/01/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 10/01/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 10/01/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 10/01/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 10/11/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 10/11/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 10/11/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/23/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 10/23/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 10/23/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary09/12/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship10/02/2019 Referred to
House Budget09/12/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.