There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

NASA Enhanced Use Lease Authority Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 51, United States Code, to allow the Administrator of the National Aeronautics and Space Administration to accept in-kind consideration for certain leases, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/12/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
09/12/2019Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/12/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Guest, Michael [R-MS-3]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 10/04/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/16/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 10/17/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 10/22/2019
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 10/23/2019
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 10/28/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/28/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/28/2019
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 10/28/2019
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 10/28/2019
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 10/28/2019
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/28/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 10/28/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/28/2019
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 10/28/2019
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/28/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 10/29/2019
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 10/29/2019
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 10/30/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/30/2019
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 10/31/2019
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 11/01/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/01/2019
Rep. Spano, Ross [R-FL-15] 11/01/2019
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3] 11/01/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 11/13/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 11/13/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 11/18/2019
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 11/19/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 11/20/2019
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 11/29/2019
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 12/04/2019
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 03/02/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science, Space, and Technology09/12/2019 Referred to

As of 08/08/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.4304 - NASA Enhanced Use Lease Authority Act of 2019


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4304. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/12/2019)

NASA Enhanced Use Lease Authority Act of 2019

This bill extends through 2029 and revises the authority of the National Aeronautical and Space Administration (NASA) to lease its non-excess real property and related personal property.

The bill expands the purposes for which NASA may enter such leases for in-kind consideration to include (1) maintaining, constructing, modifying, or improving facilities; (2) carrying out aeronautical and space research, development, testing, and evaluation activities; and (3) providing services to NASA, including launch services and payload processing services.

The annual report with respect to such leasing shall include information on (1) the value and nature of in-kind consideration, and (2) the controls in place that ensure that NASA takes advantage of such consideration.