There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Immigrant Witness and Victim Protection Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to eliminate the annual numerical limitation on U visas, to require the Secretary of Homeland Security to grant work authorization to aliens with a pending application for nonimmigrant status under subparagraph (U) or (T) of section 101(a)(15) of such Act, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/12/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
10/02/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/12/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/12/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 09/12/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 09/19/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 09/19/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/24/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 10/23/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/22/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary09/12/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship10/02/2019 Referred to

As of 08/04/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.4319 - Immigrant Witness and Victim Protection Act of 2019


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.