There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Corporate Management Accountability Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Corporate Management Accountability Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To ensure that irresponsible corporate executives, rather than shareholders, pay fines and penalties.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
12/11/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-337.
09/12/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
12/11/2019Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 268.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/11/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-337.
09/20/2019Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 31 - 22.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
09/20/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
09/19/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
09/18/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
09/12/2019Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/12/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services09/12/2019 Referred to
09/20/2019 Markup by
12/11/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-337

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4320. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House (12/11/2019)

Corporate Management Accountability Act of 2019

This bill directs the Securities and Exchange Commission to promulgate final rules requiring certain issuers of securities to disclose whether the issuer has established procedures to recoup from compensation paid to its executive officers fines and penalties for illegal behavior. If the issuer has not established such procedures, it must explain why such procedures are not necessary for the benefit of its shareholders.