There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Sex Trafficking Demand Reduction Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Trafficking Victims Protection Act of 2000 relating to determinations with respect to efforts of foreign countries to reduce demand for commercial sex acts under the minimum standards for the elimination of trafficking.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/12/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
10/01/2020Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
10/01/2020Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
09/12/2019Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/12/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 09/12/2019
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large] 11/19/2019
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 11/19/2019
Rep. Spano, Ross [R-FL-15] 11/19/2019
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 11/21/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 11/21/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 11/21/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 11/21/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 11/21/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 12/04/2019
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 12/10/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/10/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/03/2020
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 01/03/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 01/03/2020
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 01/14/2020
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6] 01/24/2020
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 01/24/2020
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 01/24/2020
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 01/28/2020
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 01/28/2020
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 01/28/2020
Rep. Miller, Carol D. [R-WV-3] 01/29/2020
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 01/29/2020
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/05/2020
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/10/2020
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/10/2020
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 02/10/2020
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 02/10/2020
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 09/01/2020
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 09/30/2020
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 09/30/2020
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 11/17/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs09/12/2019 Referred to
10/01/2020 Markup by

No related bill information was received for H.R.4326.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4326. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/12/2019)

Sex Trafficking Demand Reduction Act

This bill expands requirements for fighting human trafficking that apply to foreign countries receiving U.S. foreign assistance. (The President is authorized to reduce assistance to, or take other actions against, countries that fail to meet such requirements and are not making significant efforts to do so.)

The Department of State, when evaluating whether a country has met such requirements, shall assess whether the country has made serious efforts to prohibit the purchase of commercial sex acts if the central government has authority to do so, whereas currently the State Department must assess whether a country has made serious efforts to reduce such activities. The State Department shall also assess whether a country has made serious efforts to educate buyers of commercial sex acts on how traffickers exploit prostituted persons.