There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Investor Protection and Capital Markets Fairness Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 to allow the Securities and Exchange Commission to seek and Federal courts to grant disgorgement of unjust enrichment, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
11/18/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 314 - 95 (Roll no. 627).(text: CR H8929)
09/17/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/19/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
11/18/2019-7:15pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/18/2019-7:15pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 314 - 95 (Roll no. 627). (text: CR H8929)
11/18/2019-7:07pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8941-8942)
11/18/2019-5:51pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
11/18/2019-5:31pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4344.
11/18/2019-5:31pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8929-8932)
11/18/2019-5:31pmHouseMr. Green, Al (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/20/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 49 - 5.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
09/20/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
09/19/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
09/18/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
09/17/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
09/17/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 09/17/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Financial Services09/17/2019 Referred to
09/20/2019 Markup by
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs11/19/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4344. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (11/18/2019)

Investor Protection and Capital Markets Fairness Act

This bill provides statutory authority for the Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC) to seek disgorgement (i.e., repayment) as a remedy for unjust enrichment gained through a securities law violation. It also allows the SEC to seek certain injunctive relief.