There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

PAW and FIN Conservation Act of 2019
Protect America's Wildlife and Fish In Need of Conservation Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To terminate certain rules issued by the Secretary of the Interior and the Secretary of Commerce relating to endangered and threatened species, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/17/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
09/24/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife
09/17/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/17/2019Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/17/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (95)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 09/17/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 09/17/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 09/24/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 09/24/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 09/26/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/26/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 10/04/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 10/04/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 10/08/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 10/08/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 10/08/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/08/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/08/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 10/08/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 10/08/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 10/11/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 10/11/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 10/11/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/11/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 10/15/2019
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 10/15/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/15/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 10/15/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 10/16/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 10/17/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 10/17/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/17/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 10/18/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 10/18/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/21/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/21/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 10/21/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 10/21/2019
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/23/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 10/23/2019
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 10/28/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/28/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 10/28/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 10/28/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 10/30/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 10/30/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 10/30/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 10/30/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 11/01/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/12/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 11/13/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 11/13/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 11/13/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 11/14/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 11/14/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 11/18/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 11/19/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 11/19/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 11/19/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/19/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 11/20/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 11/20/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 11/20/2019
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 12/03/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 12/06/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 12/06/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/13/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/13/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 12/16/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 12/16/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 12/16/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/18/2019
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11] 12/18/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 01/03/2020
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 01/03/2020
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 01/03/2020
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/03/2020
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 01/17/2020
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 01/17/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources09/17/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife09/17/2019 Referred to
09/24/2019 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4348. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/17/2019)

Protect America’s Wildlife and Fish In Need of Conservation Act of 2019 or the PAW and FIN Conservation Act of 2019

This bill nullifies the 2019 rules relating to the listing of endangered or threatened species and the designation of critical habitats.

Among other things, the restored rules

  • automatically give threatened species the same protections as endangered species;
  • revise requirements governing when an agency must consult with the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service or the National Marine Fisheries Service about endangered species, threatened species, or their habitats;
  • prohibit economic assessments from being considered in listing decisions; and
  • revise the criteria used for designating critical habitats for the species.