There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Yes In My Backyard Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Yes In My Backyard Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require certain grantees under title I of the Housing and Community Development Act of 1974 to submit a plan to track discriminatory land use policies, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
03/02/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
09/17/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber All Actions
03/03/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
03/02/2020-5:43pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/02/2020-5:43pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1431)
03/02/2020-5:30pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4351.
03/02/2020-5:30pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1430-1432)
03/02/2020-5:30pmHouseMr. San Nicolas moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
02/28/2020HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
02/28/2020HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
02/27/2020HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
09/17/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
09/17/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (13)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Financial Services09/17/2019 Referred to
02/28/2020 Markup by
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs03/03/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4351. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (03/02/2020)

Yes In My Backyard Act

This bill requires certain Community Development Block Grant program recipients to submit to the Department of Housing and Urban Development information regarding their implementation of certain land-use policies (e.g., policies for reducing minimum lot size).