There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

IOGAN Act
Identifying Outputs of Generative Adversarial Networks Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

IOGAN Act
Identifying Outputs of Generative Adversarial Networks Act

Short Titles as Introduced

IOGAN Act
Identifying Outputs of Generative Adversarial Networks Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Director of the National Science Foundation to support research on the outputs that may be generated by generative adversarial networks, otherwise known as deepfakes, and other comparable techniques that may be developed in the future, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/09/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9363-9364)
11/05/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 116-268.
09/17/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/10/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
12/09/2019-3:45pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/09/2019-3:45pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9363-9364)
12/09/2019-3:39pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4355.
12/09/2019-3:39pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9363-9364)
12/09/2019-3:39pmHouseMs. Johnson (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/05/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 213.
11/05/2019HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 116-268.
09/25/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
09/25/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
09/17/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
09/17/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (9)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science, Space, and Technology09/17/2019 Referred to
09/25/2019 Markup by
11/05/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-268
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation12/10/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4355. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House (11/05/2019)

Identifying Outputs of Generative Adversarial Networks Act or the IOGAN Act

This bill directs the National Science Foundation (NSF) and the National Institute of Standards and Technology (NIST) to support research on manipulated or synthesized media, including the output of generative adversarial networks. A generative adversarial network is a software system designed to be trained with authentic inputs (e.g., photographs) to generate similar, but artificial, outputs (e.g., deepfakes).

Specifically, the NSF must support research on manipulated or synthesized content and information authenticity and NIST must support research for the development of measurements and standards necessary to accelerate the development of the technological tools to examine the function and outputs of generative adversarial networks or other technologies that synthesize or manipulate content.