There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Protecting Families of Fallen Servicemembers Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Protecting Families of Fallen Servicemembers Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Protecting Families of Fallen Servicemembers Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Protecting Families of Fallen Servicemembers Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act to allow certain individuals to terminate contracts for telephone, multichannel video programming, or internet access service, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
01/05/2021Became Public Law No: 116-285.
01/05/2021Signed by President.
12/24/2020Presented to President.
12/15/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/15/2020Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7508)
11/12/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8757)
09/17/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/05/2021Became Public Law No: 116-285.
01/05/2021Signed by President.
12/24/2020HousePresented to President.
12/16/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/15/2020SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/15/2020SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7508)
11/13/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
11/12/2019-5:09pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/12/2019-5:09pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8757)
11/12/2019-5:01pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4356.
11/12/2019-5:01pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8757-8758)
11/12/2019-5:01pmHouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/29/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
10/29/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
10/29/2019HouseSubcommittee on Economic Opportunity Discharged.
10/02/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
09/17/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
09/17/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 09/17/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs09/17/2019 Referred to
10/29/2019 Markup by
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity10/02/2019 Referred to
10/29/2019 Discharged from
Senate Veterans' Affairs11/13/2019 Referred to
12/15/2020 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.4356. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-285 (01/05/2021)

Protecting Families of Fallen Servicemembers Act

This bill revises the conditions allowing a service member to terminate a commercial mobile, telephone exchange, internet access, or multichannel video programming service contract at any time after the date the service member receives military orders to relocate for at least 90 days to a location that does not support such contract. It treats as individuals covered, and therefore allowed to terminate such a contract (1) a spouse or dependent of a service member who dies while in military service or a member of the reserve components performing full-time or active reserve duty or inactive-duty training; (2) a spouse or dependent of a service member who incurs a catastrophic injury or illness, if the member incurs the injury or illness while in military service or performing such duty; and (3) a member of the reserve components performing such duty.