There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Police Exercising Absolute Care With Everyone Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide that a Federal law enforcement officer may not use deadly force or less lethal force unless such force is necessary, to encourage States to adopt similar laws or policies, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/17/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
10/02/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/17/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/17/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (84)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 09/17/2019
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 09/17/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/24/2020
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 01/24/2020
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/24/2020
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 02/05/2020
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/04/2020
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 06/04/2020
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/04/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 06/04/2020
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/04/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/04/2020
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 06/04/2020
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/04/2020
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/04/2020
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 06/04/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/04/2020
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 06/04/2020
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/04/2020
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/04/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 06/04/2020
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/04/2020
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/04/2020
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 06/04/2020
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 06/04/2020
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 06/04/2020
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 06/04/2020
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/04/2020
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/04/2020
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/04/2020
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 06/08/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 06/08/2020
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 06/08/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/08/2020
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 06/08/2020
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/08/2020
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/08/2020
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/08/2020
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 06/08/2020
Del. San Nicolas, Michael F. Q. [D-GU-At Large] 06/08/2020
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/08/2020
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 06/08/2020
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 06/08/2020
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/08/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 06/08/2020
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 06/08/2020
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 06/08/2020
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/08/2020
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/11/2020
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/11/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 06/11/2020
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/11/2020
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 06/11/2020
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/11/2020
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/11/2020
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/11/2020
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/11/2020
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 06/11/2020
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/11/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/15/2020
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 06/15/2020
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/15/2020
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 06/15/2020
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 06/15/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary09/17/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security10/02/2019 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4359.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4359. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/17/2019)

Police Exercising Absolute Care With Everyone Act of 2019

This bill establishes a framework to reduce the unnecessary use of force by law enforcement at the federal, state, and local levels.

At the federal level, the bill limits the use of force by federal law enforcement officers. It prohibits the use of deadly force, except as a last resort to prevent imminent and serious bodily injury or death. It also prohibits the use of less lethal force, unless it is necessary and proportionate to effectuate an arrest. Finally, it limits the use of a justification defense for a federal law enforcement officer who is charged with murder or manslaughter.

At the state and local level, the bill conditions eligibility for funds under the Edward Byrne Memorial Justice Assistance Grant Program on the enactment of consistent limitations.