There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (9)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Continuing Appropriations Act, 2020, and Health Extenders Act of 2019

Short Titles as Enacted for portions of this bill
  • Continuing Appropriations Act, 2020

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Continuing Appropriations Act, 2020, and Health Extenders Act of 2019

Short Titles as Passed House for portions of this bill
  • Continuing Appropriations Act, 2020

Short Titles as Introduced

Continuing Appropriations Act, 2020, and Health Extenders Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • Continuing Appropriations Act, 2020

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Continuing Appropriations Act, 2020, and Health Extenders Act of 2019

Short Titles as Passed Senate for portions of this bill
  • Continuing Appropriations Act, 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Making continuing appropriations for fiscal year 2020, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
09/27/2019Became Public Law No: 116-59. (TXT | PDF)
09/27/2019Signed by President.
09/27/2019Presented to President.
09/26/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate, under the order of 9/25/19, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 81 - 16. Record Vote Number: 311.
09/19/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 301 - 123 (Roll no. 538).(text: CR H7786-7791)
09/18/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
09/27/2019Became Public Law No: 116-59. (TXT | PDF)
09/27/2019Signed by President.
09/27/2019HousePresented to President.
09/26/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/26/2019SenatePassed Senate, under the order of 9/25/19, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 81 - 16. Record Vote Number: 311.
09/26/2019SenateS.Amdt.942 Amendment SA 942 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 24 - 73. Record Vote Number: 310.
09/26/2019SenateS.Amdt.942 Amendment SA 942 proposed by Senator Paul. (consideration: CR S5722-5723; text: CR S5722)
09/26/2019SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5713-5715, S5722-5723)
09/23/2019SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 213.
09/19/2019SenateReceived in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
09/19/2019-3:30pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/19/2019-3:30pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 301 - 123 (Roll no. 538). (text: CR H7786-7791)
09/19/2019-2:57pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
09/19/2019-2:15pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 4378.
09/19/2019-2:13pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 564. (consideration: CR H7786-7796)
09/19/2019-12:28pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 564 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4378 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
09/18/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/18/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/18/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Appropriations09/18/2019 Referred to
House Budget09/18/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (67)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4378. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (09/26/2019)

Continuing Appropriations Act, 2020, and Health Extenders Act of 2019

This bill provides FY2020 continuing appropriations to federal agencies through November 21, 2019.

It is known as a continuing resolution (CR) and prevents a government shutdown that would otherwise occur when FY2020 begins on October 1, 2019, if the 12 regular appropriations bills that fund the federal government for FY2020 have not been enacted.

The CR funds most projects and activities at the FY2019 levels with several exceptions that provide funding flexibility and additional appropriations to various programs.

Additionally, the CR extends several programs that are scheduled to expire at the end of FY2019, including

  • several health programs,
  • the National Flood Insurance Program,
  • the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) program and related programs,
  • several authorities related to immigration,
  • the Calfed Bay-Delta Authorization Act,
  • the Department of Education's National Advisory Committee on Institutional Quality and Integrity,
  • the Export-Import Bank of the United States, and
  • the U.S. Commission on International Religious Freedom.

The bill also includes a provision that permits the Department of Agriculture to continue making payments to farmers affected by retaliatory tariffs by accelerating reimbursements to the Commodity Credit Corporation for certain net realized losses sustained in FY2019.