There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Stop the Wait Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title II of the Social Security Act to eliminate the Medicare and disability insurance benefits waiting periods for disabled individuals.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/18/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
09/19/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
09/19/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/18/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
09/18/2019Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/18/2019Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/18/2019Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/18/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (45)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4]* 09/18/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6]* 09/18/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/20/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 09/27/2019
Rep. Fletcher, Lizzie [D-TX-7] 10/23/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/23/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 10/23/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 10/23/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 11/13/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 11/13/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 11/20/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 02/13/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 10/13/2020
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/13/2020

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means09/18/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Social Security09/18/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce09/18/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health09/19/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure09/18/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials09/19/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.