There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Women's Business Centers Improvements Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Reported to House

Women’s Business Centers Improvements Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Women’s Business Centers Improvements Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Small Business Act to improve the women's business center program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
10/21/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8268-8272)
10/17/2019Reported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 116-239.
09/19/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/22/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
10/21/2019-4:02pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/21/2019-4:02pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8268-8272)
10/21/2019-3:43pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4405.
10/21/2019-3:43pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8268-8274)
10/21/2019-3:43pmHouseMs. Velazquez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
10/17/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 190.
10/17/2019HouseReported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 116-239.
09/25/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Small Business
09/25/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Small Business
09/19/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Small Business.
09/19/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (17)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Small Business09/19/2019 Referred to
09/25/2019 Markup by
10/17/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-239
Senate Small Business and Entrepreneurship10/22/2019 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4405.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4405. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (10/21/2019)

Women's Business Centers Improvements Act of 2019

This bill reauthorizes the Women's Business Center Program through FY2023, raises the cap on individual center grants, establishes an accreditation program for grant recipients, and revises the duties of the Office of Women's Business Ownership.

Specifically, the bill modifies the Women's Business Center Program to enable the Small Business Administration (SBA) to provide initial and continuation grants to eligible entities to operate women's business centers for the benefit of women-owned small businesses. An entity must agree to obtain matching, non-federal funds, and the SBA must (1) ensure an applicant has sufficient resources to provide the services for which the grant is being made, and (2) conduct an annual compliance review. The SBA must also publish standards for a program to accredit entities that receive grants from the Women's Business Center Program, and such entities' receipt of continuation grants shall be contingent upon their obtaining accreditation.