There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Eric Garner Excessive Use of Force Prevention Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend section 242 of title 18, United States Code, to forbid the use of chokeholds by persons subject to that provision's prohibitions, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/19/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
10/28/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/19/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/19/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (125)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 09/20/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/24/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/28/2020
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 05/28/2020
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 05/28/2020
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 05/28/2020
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 05/28/2020
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/04/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 06/04/2020
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/04/2020
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10] 06/04/2020
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 06/04/2020
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/04/2020
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 06/04/2020
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 06/04/2020
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 06/04/2020
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/04/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/04/2020
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 06/04/2020
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 06/04/2020
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/04/2020
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 06/04/2020
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 06/04/2020
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 06/04/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 06/04/2020
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 06/04/2020
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 06/04/2020
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/04/2020
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 06/04/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 06/04/2020
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 06/04/2020
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 06/04/2020
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 06/04/2020
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 06/04/2020
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/04/2020
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 06/04/2020
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 06/04/2020
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/04/2020
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/04/2020
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 06/04/2020
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32] 06/04/2020
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large] 06/04/2020
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/04/2020
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 06/04/2020
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/04/2020
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14] 06/04/2020
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/04/2020
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 06/04/2020
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/04/2020
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/04/2020
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/04/2020
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 06/04/2020
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 06/04/2020
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 06/04/2020
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 06/04/2020
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/04/2020
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 06/04/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/04/2020
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/04/2020
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/04/2020
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 06/04/2020
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 06/04/2020
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/04/2020
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/04/2020
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 06/04/2020
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/04/2020
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 06/04/2020
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 06/04/2020
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 06/04/2020
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/04/2020
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 06/08/2020
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 06/08/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/08/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 06/08/2020
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 06/08/2020
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/08/2020
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 06/08/2020
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 06/08/2020
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 06/08/2020
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 06/08/2020
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/08/2020
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 06/08/2020
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/08/2020
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/08/2020
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/08/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 06/08/2020
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 06/08/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 06/08/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 06/11/2020
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/11/2020
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/11/2020
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 06/11/2020
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/11/2020
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 06/11/2020
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/11/2020
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/15/2020
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 06/15/2020
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 06/18/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary09/19/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security10/28/2019 Referred to

As of 07/09/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.4408 - Eric Garner Excessive Use of Force Prevention Act of 2019


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4408. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/19/2019)

Eric Garner Excessive Use of Force Prevention Act of 2019

This bill modifies the criminal civil rights statute that prohibits the deprivation of rights under color of law.

Currently, the second prong of the prohibition bars the application of different punishments, pains, or penalties based on an individual's alien status, color, or race. This bill specifies that the application of any pressure to a person's throat or windpipe which may prevent or hinder breathing or reduce intake of air (e.g., a chokehold) constitutes a punishment, pain, or penalty.