There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

National Poverty Research Center Authorization Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize a National Poverty Research Center.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/20/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
09/20/2019Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/20/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (45)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/20/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 09/20/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/24/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 09/26/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 10/04/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/04/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/04/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 10/04/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 10/22/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 10/28/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 10/29/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 11/01/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 11/01/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 11/08/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 11/08/2019
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 11/13/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 11/13/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 11/13/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 11/13/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 11/13/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 11/13/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/13/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 11/13/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 11/13/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/13/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/13/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/13/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/14/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 11/14/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 11/14/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 11/14/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 11/19/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 11/19/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 11/19/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 11/19/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 11/19/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/21/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 12/05/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 12/10/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/03/2020
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 01/15/2020
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/24/2020
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 01/24/2020
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 02/03/2020
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 02/21/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Reform09/20/2019 Referred to

As of 08/12/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.4436 - National Poverty Research Center Authorization Act


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4436. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/20/2019)

National Poverty Research Center Authorization Act

This bill requires the Department of Health and Human Services to award grants to institutions of higher education for National Poverty Research Centers. In addition to conducting poverty policy research, such centers must coordinate nationwide research networks to inform public policies aimed at reducing poverty in the United States.