Text: H.R.4439 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Received in Senate (09/30/2020)


116th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 4439


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

September 30 (legislative day, September 29), 2020

Received


AN ACT

To amend the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to extend the authority of the Secretary of Health and Human Services to issue priority review vouchers to encourage treatments for rare pediatric diseases.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Creating Hope Reauthorization Act”.

SEC. 2. Extension of authority to issue priority review vouchers to encourage treatments for rare pediatric diseases.

Section 529(b)(5) of the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act (21 U.S.C. 360ff(b)(5)) is amended—

(1) by striking “December 11, 2020” each place it appears and inserting “September 30, 2024”; and

(2) in subparagraph (B), by striking “December 11, 2022” and inserting “September 30, 2026”.

Passed the House of Representatives September 29, 2020.

    Attest: cheryl l. johnson,   
    Clerk

Share This